Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jeremiah Abednego Mcconney, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
CategoryNisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDismissbyplaint |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO FILE IN BOX 07-04 | |
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event | MTN/ORDER TO DISMISS /S/GMB 1/29/07 | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | DEF COPY: 202 WOODBRIDGE BLVD #118 TEMPLE TX | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | A-AFFORDABLE BAIL BONDS | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI W/AFFS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.