Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ford Motor Credit, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Tina Wilson, Jim Wilson, Jim Wilson Et Al, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Agreement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2007 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 9810/WILSONS/VINCENT ? SGD 09/28/07 | |
September 27, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO DEF, CCM 9810 | |
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event | CIVIL JUDGES DOCKET | |
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | SENT FILE TO GMB | |
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | AMEND AFFIDAVIT OF SRV/JIM WILSON | |
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | AMEND AFFIDAVIT OF SRV/TINA WILSON | |
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO GMB | |
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event | PL'S MTN FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDG W/AFFS | |
May 02, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDG, TO GMB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.