Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hudson & Keyse Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Paul M Castillo, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 3.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategorySuit On Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House3 |
Case Outcome TypeDefault |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2007 | Docket Event | FILE CCM 4484/PAUL CASTILLO SGD/STMPD | |
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDG TO DEF, CCM 4484 | |
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED GMB | |
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER GIVEN TO GMB | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT, TO GMB | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | MTN FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDG W/AFFS | |
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event | C is Filed - PAUL M CASTILLO | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | PL'S ORIGINAL PETITION W/DISCOVERY | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | PRINT SERVICE- CITATION PAUL M CASTILLO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.