Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Isaac Gomez, Krohn-Gomez, Megan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gomez, Isaac, Megan Krohn-Gomez, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 169 with Cari L. Starritt-Burnett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCari L. Starritt-Burnett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce: Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House169 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2024 |
Modification HEARING TO ENTER ORDER CHANGED HEARING TYPE FROM PROVE UP TO MOD |
||
December 08, 2023 |
Report MEDIATION REPORT TO THE COURT |
||
December 08, 2023 | MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - CM SAW | ||
November 13, 2023 |
CountClaim/CrssAct/Interpl/Interv/3rdPartyContest (efile) COUNTERPETITION TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP BY DARBY |
||
May 12, 2023 | CERTIFICATE PARENTING CLASS BY MEGAN KROHN-GOMEZ | ||
May 10, 2023 |
Certificate PARENTING CERTIFICATE BY ISAAC GOMEZ |
||
April 10, 2023 |
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver (e-File) RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER BY DARBY |
||
March 24, 2023 |
Served Service SERVED CNR ON ISAAC GOMEZ |
||
March 06, 2023 |
Clerk's Copy CLERKS COPY OF CITATION TO ISAAC |
||
March 06, 2023 | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.