Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tax Appraisal District Of Bell, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Burrow, Davie, Davis, Charles F., Talafuseof, Carol, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 169 with Starritt-Burnett, Cari presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStarritt-Burnett, Cari Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House169 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2022 |
Returned Mail Undeliverable RETURNED ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO DAVIE BURROW |
||
April 20, 2022 |
Clerk's Copy order of dismissal x 3 |
||
April 11, 2022 |
Order to Dismiss ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED BY JUDGE STARRITT-BURNETT 04/12/22 |
||
April 11, 2022 |
Motion to Dismiss MOTION FOR DISMISSAL BY ALLEN CM SAW |
||
July 23, 2021 |
Unserved Service UNSERVED CITATION TO DAVIE BURROW |
||
July 09, 2021 |
Served Service SERVED CITATION TO CAROL TALAFUSEOF ON 07/08/21 |
||
July 09, 2021 |
Answer ORIGINAL ANSWER BY STOEBNER |
||
July 07, 2021 | Citation | ||
July 07, 2021 |
Clerk's Copy CLERKS COPY OF CITATION TO DAVIE |
||
July 07, 2021 |
Clerk's Copy CLERKS COPY OF CITATION TO CAROL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.