Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Amy Leanne Corprew, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jonathan Weley Corprew, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 146 with Jones, Jack W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, Jack W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce: Children |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House146 |
Case Outcome TypeNot Final |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 | Enter Order | ||
March 30, 2023 | MOTION TO ENTER ORDER - SD SAW/SET | ||
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Hearing
Judge: Jones, Jack W |
|
January 11, 2023 |
Docket Entry Prater and Darby appeared - attys agree to requested order for drug test - JJ |
||
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance of Counsel ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY DARBY |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Hearing
Judge: Jones, Jack W |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Prater appeared for P - R appeared pro se - parties agreed to reset hearing to allow R to retain an atty - JJ |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Served Service SERVED CITATION TO JONATHAN WELEY CORPREW 11/15/22 |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Served Service SERVED SHOWCAUSE TO JONATHAN WELEY CORPREW 11/15/22 |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice (e-File) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR JONATHAN CORPREW SD SAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.