Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Ford, Stephen H, Sr, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 146 with Jones, Jack W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, Jack W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Consumer/Dtpa |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House146 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 |
Returned Mail Undeliverable RETURNED MAIL FOR STEPHEN |
||
September 13, 2021 |
Returned Green Card NOTICE OF JUDGMENT TO ELISE MANCHESTER |
||
September 01, 2021 |
Clerk's Copy Notice of Default x 2 |
||
August 26, 2021 |
Order for Default Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED BY JUDGE JONES 8/30/21 |
||
August 26, 2021 |
Motion for Default Judgment PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
August 26, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | ||
July 09, 2021 |
Served Service SERVED CITATION FOR STEPHEN FORD DR SERVED 7/06/21 |
||
June 22, 2021 | Citation | ||
June 22, 2021 | CLERK'S COPY OF CIT -STEPHEN H FORD SR- EZ MESSENGER MAILED 6/23/2021 | ||
June 02, 2021 | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.