Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Samantha Savoie, Jason David Williams, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Jason David Williams, Christian Hunter Savoie, Christian Hunter Savoie Williams, Samantha Savoie, in the jurisdiction of Bell County, TX, . Bell County, TX Superior Courts 169.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2003 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBell County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Filing Court House169 |
Case Outcome TypeNonjury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED- RECO | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to RECO | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to CTAG | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | **- FILE FOLDER RETURNED- RECO | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | **- file folder given to RECO | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ****FILE RETURNED FROM STORAGE**** | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER (CONFIRMATION OF | |
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | APPROVAL OF CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER AND WAIVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.