Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Knapp, Miranda Shy, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth J. Hara Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions149 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time149 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.