Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schneckloth, Kimberly, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Schneckloth, Dustin, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2013 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.