Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against White, Michael George Charles, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2012 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
March 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.