Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lal, Sarna D, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Lal, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2012 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
January 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Petition | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted | |
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.