Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banuelos, Elisa Elizabeth, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Blizard, Joseph Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2012 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Protective Restraining Order | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Petition with Minor Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.