Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fernandez, Hortencia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fernandezzamora, Armando, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non Service | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Denied | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.