Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Warr, Maegan Lindsay, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Anglin, Troy, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Westbrook, Robert B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Robert B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryNullity With Minor Children |
Time To Trial842 days |
Last RefreshedJune 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions436 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time436 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order- Reschedule |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.