Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nicastro, Rob, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nicastro, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.