Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gorgees, Argentina, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Prasad, Alvin, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Williamsen, Nancy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliamsen, Nancy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: April 04, 2011Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant
Date: December 30, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non-Military Status | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.