Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Amerikar, Sargony, Ninous, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Pedilla, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2011 |
CategoryBusiness Small Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | SC Judgment: Uncontested | |
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.