Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Evins, Peter Jerome, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Evins, Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.