Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arevalos, Serena, Arevalos, Alyssa, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2010 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person/Relative |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Subsequent Petition Hearing | |
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Denied | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Stat Closure: PR Permanent Letters Issued | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Report | |
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Relative Guardianship | |
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Additional Fee Waiver Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.