Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harrington, Leonard, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harrington, Sonia Gay, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jack M. Jacobson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJack M. Jacobson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | 170 Judge Jack M. Jacobson | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.