Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Greene, Michele Y, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ausara, Ammauaakhu, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2008 |
CategoryNullity Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed | |
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.