Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Krista Dawn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Diaz, Edgar Raul, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Denied | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed | |
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.