Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Margarite, Shelli Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Donart, Scott David, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed | |
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Respondent's 191 Filed | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.