Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Cecilia Silva, Hernandez, Vineta, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2008 |
CategoryCompromise Of Disputed Claim |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Order Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.