Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnc Funding Llc, Scranton, filed a(n) case against Depre, Mary, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, PA, . Wayne County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Bonnie L. Carney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Bonnie L. Carney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWayne County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 22-3-03 Applies to Mary Depre, Defendant |
|
February 09, 2011 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jane E. Farrell |
|
November 23, 2010 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jane E. Farrell |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 22-3-03 Applies to LVNC Funding LLC, Plaintiff |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by LVNC Funding LLC |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 22-3-03 Applies to LVNC Funding LLC, Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.