Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc C O Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C., filed a(n) case against Hurley, John R., in the jurisdiction of Pike County, PA, . Pike County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Deborah Fischer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Deborah Fischer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPike County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Judgment to Common Pleas Filed by LVNV Funding LLC c/o Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C. Applies to John R. Hurley, Defendant LVNV Funding LLC c/o Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C., Plaintiff |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vacated Filed by Magisterial District Court 60-3-01 Applies to John R. Hurley, Defendant LVNV Funding LLC c/o Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C., Plaintiff |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Entered by Plaintiff Filed by LVNV Funding LLC c/o Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C. Applies to John R. Hurley, Defendant LVNV Funding LLC c/o Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C., Plaintiff |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
First Class Entry of Satisfaction Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 60-3-01 Applies to LVNV Funding LLC c/o Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C., Plaintiff |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
First Class Entry of Satisfaction Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 60-3-01 Applies to John R. Hurley, Defendant |
|
November 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Deborah Fischer |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 60-3-01 Applies to John R. Hurley, Defendant |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 60-3-01 Applies to John R. Hurley, Defendant |
|
September 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Deborah Fischer |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 60-3-01 Applies to John R. Hurley, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.