Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
City Of Philadelphia filed a(n) Zoning - Property case in the jurisdiction of Philadelphia County, PA, . Philadelphia County, PA Superior Courts with Joshua H. Roberts presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoshua H. Roberts Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryZoning Board Of Adjustment |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPhiladelphia County, PA |
Matter TypeZoning |
APPEAL DISMISSED/APPELLAT CT
Date: December 05, 2022APPEAL INVENTORY RECORD SENT
Date: May 31, 2022OPINION FILED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: May 27, 2022STATEMENT OF MATTERS (1925(B))
Date: April 25, 2022ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00APPEAL TO COMMONWEALTH COURT
Date: 2022-03-31T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED - FINAL DISPOS
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO SUPPL/ATTACH FILED
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00ORDER ENTERED/236 NOTICE GIVEN
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00MOTION/PETITION REPLY FILED
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00ANSWER (MOTION/PETITION) FILED
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00MOT-FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00NOTICE-FAILURE TO COMPLY
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00SCHEDULING ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00PRAECIPE TO INTERVENE
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00ENTRY OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF STATUTORY APPEAL
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: May 31, 2022LISTED FOR ORAL ARGUMENTS
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: May 27, 2022FEE PD PURSUANT TO ORDER
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL SENT
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00MOTION ASSIGNED
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00RECORD MAILED/TRANSMITTED
Date: May 31, 2022NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00WAITING TO LIST ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE GIVEN UNDER RULE 236
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00WAITING/ISSUE SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ISSUED
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00ACTIVE CASE
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00LISTED FOR ORAL ARGUMENTS
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.