Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bridgeport Borough, filed a(n) 5/4/2023 case represented by Portnoff, Michelle R, against Wilson, Kaitlyn Marie, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with No presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
Category5/4/2023 |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfied -For Cases Filed After 1992 | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Praec to Reissue Writ | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Praec & Writ of Scire Facias Govt | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Municipal Lien Govt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.