Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sanchez, Joana, filed a(n) 11/11/2021 case represented by Snyder, Robert P, against Davis, David A, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with No presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
Category11/11/2021 |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Discontinue For Cases Filed 1993 & Above | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Not Found as to | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Praec to Reinstate | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Not Found as to | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint Civil Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.