Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Olson, Margaret, filed a(n) 12/19/2022 case represented by Javie, Jason D, against Doe, Jane, Doe, John, Peoples Commerce, Swygert, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with No presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
Category12/19/2022 |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Praec to Withdraw | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Praec to Reinstate | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Copy | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Copy | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Praec to Reinstate | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Not Found as to | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.