Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Abington Township School District, filed a(n) 8/2/2021 case represented by Obrien, Colin John, against Abington Tonwship Police Department, Wawa Store # 74, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with No presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
Category8/2/2021 |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Scheduling | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Praecipe | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.