Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) case against Akins, Francine A, in the jurisdiction of Mckean County, PA, . Mckean County, PA Superior Courts with David Richard Engman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Richard Engman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMckean County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: David Richard Engman |
|
December 28, 2022 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: David Richard Engman |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by Francine A Akins Applies to Francine A Akins, Defendant |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 48-3-04 Applies to Francine A Akins, Defendant |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by LVNV Funding LLC |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 48-3-04 Applies to Francine A Akins, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.