Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Carriage House Apartments ,, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Goodwin, Natikwa, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Real Property - Landlord/Tenant Dispute |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Tenant Supersedeas Affidavit (Non-Section 8)
Date: February 01, 2023Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 10-30-2023
Date: February 01, 2023Notice of Appeal
Date: February 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 236 Notice of Order Sent on 02/24/2023; J. Eckel Order Granting Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition to Consolidate Petition |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice of Appeal | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Arbitration Case Initiated | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Tenant Supersedeas Affidavit (Non-Section 8) | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 10-30-2023 Arbitration Date |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.