Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Painters Crossing Associates, filed a(n) Civil Nr - Judgment - Mdj Transfer case against Conway, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Nr - Judgment - Mdj Transfer |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
|
Receipt #000515801 for $23.75 paid for by Donald J. Weiss
Date: January 31, 2023Judgment/Praecipe for Judgment
Date: January 31, 2023Judgment Entered for on 01-31-2023 236 Notice of Judgment Sent 01-31-2023
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled for August 18, 2023 @ 10 AM Hearing Date |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000542070 for $10.00 paid for by Donald J. Weiss Receipt |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Praecipe to Withdraw Motion for Reassessment Praecipe to Withdraw |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Issued and Writ Exit | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000533032 for $30.00 paid for by Donald J. Weiss Receipt |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reassessment of Damages ET'L.; Motion for Reassessment of Damages |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000515801 for $23.75 paid for by Donald J. Weiss Receipt |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment/Praecipe for Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.