Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hunter, Lakia, Parott, Violett, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Doe, John, Mckenzie, Jaden, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint
Date: January 31, 2023Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 10-30-2023
Date: January 31, 2023Receipt #000515737 for $297.25 paid for by Samuel Addison Anyan
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Continuance Granted New Hearing Date-1/31/2024 @ 9:30 AM Application for Continuance Granted |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for Continuance | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000557688 for $26.00 paid for by Darelee Hamilton Receipt |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Cover Sheet Pursuant to Rule 208.1; Motion Cover Sheet |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Compel; 236 Notice of Order Sent 09/05/2023; (J. ECKEL) Order Granting Motion to Compel |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000542863 for $26.00 paid for by Darelee Hamilton Receipt |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Cover Sheet; Motion Cover Sheet |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Verification; Verification |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief; Brief |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dfndt(s)Petition to Compel; Petition to Compel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.