Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Coleman, Daniel, Green, Lakia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Doe, Uhrik, Alyssa, Uhrik, Rosemary, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint
Date: January 30, 2023Receipt #000515575 for $297.25 paid for by Nicholas Renzi
Date: January 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000558009 for $26.00 paid for by Christopher M Gallagher Receipt |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Cover Sheet; Motion Cover Sheet |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dfndt(s) Motion to Compel Discovery; Motion to Compel Discovery |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief; Brief |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's New Matter | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000530557 for $50.00 paid for by Christopher M Gallagher Receipt |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance for Defendant | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return DF Served on 02/22/2023 $91.00 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.