Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sagos, Vassiliki, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Shelby, Monique D., in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryCivil - Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Receipt #000515550 for $297.25 paid for by Robert A DeLuca
Date: January 30, 2023Writ of Summons
Date: January 30, 2023Writ Issued and Writ Exit
Date: January 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate Prerequisite to Service of Subpoena | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Gary J. Brascetta Withdrawal of Appearance Megan D. Hazel Entry of Appearance |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's New Matter | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate Prerequisite to Service of Subpoena | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000538913 for $10.00 paid for by Megan Hazel Receipt |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe for Rule to File Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.