Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Torrance, Daria Mccann, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Studio 882. Llc A K A Studio 882 Furniture And Design, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Contract - Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint {E-FILED}
Date: September 06, 2021Receipt #000428305 for $297.25 paid for by Dennis J. Muir
Date: September 07, 2021Praecipe for Appearance of Briana Lynn Pearson (First Filing by Defendant) e-filed
Date: October 04, 2021Receipt #000432714 for $50.00 paid for by Briana Pearson
Date: October 05, 2021DEFENDANT'S ANSWER, NEW MATTER, DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIM e-filed
Date: October 04, 2021Receipt #000452544 for $10.00 paid for by Dennis J. Muir
Date: February 04, 2022Receipt #000432718 for $50.00 paid for by Briana Pearson
Date: October 05, 2021Praecipe to Settle, Discontinue, and End
Date: February 02, 2022Plaintiff's Answer to New Matter, Defenses and Counterclaim (e-filed)
Date: October 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000452544 for $10.00 paid for by Dennis J. Muir Receipt |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Settle, Discontinue, and End | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Answer to New Matter, Defenses and Counterclaim (e-filed) Plaintiff's Reply to New Matters |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000432714 for $50.00 paid for by Briana Pearson Receipt |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000432718 for $50.00 paid for by Briana Pearson Receipt |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Praecipe for Appearance of Briana Lynn Pearson (First Filing by Defendant) e-filed Praecipe for Appearance (First Filing by Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S ANSWER, NEW MATTER, DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIM e-filed Answer and Counterclaim |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return, 9-17-21 - Studio 882, LLC a/k/a Studio 882 Furniture and Design, (Agent in Charge/Chad Groves, Rep) SERVED, $53.00 Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 06-06-2022 Arbitration Date |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Arbitration Case Initiated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.