Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Perry, Roul, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Contract - Debt Collection: Credit Card |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Receipt #000427822 for $297.25 paid for by Michael R. Lipinski
Date: September 02, 2021Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 06-01-2022
Date: September 02, 2021Judgment Entered for Failure to File an Answer {E-FILED} 236N/S 11-4-2021
Date: November 02, 2021Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return, 9-20-21 - Roul Perry. SERVED, $50.60.
Date: September 27, 2021Judgment Entered for on 11-04-2021 236 Notice of Judgment Sent 11-04-2021
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered for on 11-04-2021 236 Notice of Judgment Sent 11-04-2021 Judgment Entered |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered for Failure to File an Answer {E-FILED} 236N/S 11-4-2021 Default Judgment |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return, 9-20-21 - Roul Perry. SERVED, $50.60. Sheriff's Service Process Receipt and Affidavit of Return |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000427822 for $297.25 paid for by Michael R. Lipinski Receipt |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Hearing Scheduled for 06-01-2022 Arbitration Date |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint w/cdf {E-FILED} Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.