Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
0431 Note, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Holloway, Jacqueline, Holloway, Patrick, Main Line Sport Property, Llc, P-One Athletics, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Contract - Debt Collection: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Receipt #000427790 for $297.25 paid for by ALBERT A CIARDI
Date: September 01, 2021Entry of Appearance
Date: December 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000471599 for $10.00 paid for by Siedman Daniel Receipt |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Settle, Discontinue, and End | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order -Preliminary Objections Overruled; 236 Notice of Order Sent 04/11/22; (J. DOZOR) Order for Preliminary Objections Overruled |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Law | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt #000441971 for $10.00 paid for by Siedman Daniel Receipt |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Law E-FILED Memorandum of Law |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Praecipe for Determination. Praecipe With Fee |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Law e-filed Memorandum of Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.