Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Birchwood Condominium Association, filed a(n) Civil - Miscellaneous - Civil Miscellaneous: Other case against Mccabe, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, PA, . Delaware County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Miscellaneous - Civil Miscellaneous: Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, PA |
|
Complaint (e-filed)
Date: September 01, 2021Receipt #000427783 for $297.25 paid for by Michelle J Stranen
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report and Award of Arbitrators; 236 Notice Sent on 09/12/2022; (ARB. PANEL) Report and Award of Arbitrators |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service e/filed Certificate of Service |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Memorandum e/filed Pre Trial Memorandum |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Continuance Granted New Hearing date: 9-8-2022 Time - TBA Application for Continuance Granted |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for Continuance | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application for Continuance Granted New Date 7/8/22 @ TBA Application for Continuance Granted |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Application for Continuance | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-ARBITRATION MEMORANDUM Pre Trial Memorandum |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.