Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnc Funding Llc, Scranton, filed a(n) case against Fordick, Denise, in the jurisdiction of Cambria County, PA, . Cambria County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge John Prebish Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge John Prebish Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCambria County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 47-3-03 Applies to Denise Fordick, Defendant |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Entered by Plaintiff Filed by LVNC Funding LLC Applies to Denise Fordick, Defendant |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
First Class Entry of Satisfaction Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 47-3-03 Applies to LVNC Funding LLC, Plaintiff |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 47-3-03 Applies to Denise Fordick, Defendant |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 47-3-03 Applies to Denise Fordick, Defendant |
|
March 28, 2011 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Galen F. Decort |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 47-3-03 Applies to Denise Fordick, Defendant |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Michael F. Ratchford, Esq. Applies to LVNC Funding LLC, Plaintiff |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 47-3-03 Applies to Denise Fordick, Defendant |
|
February 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by LVNC Funding LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.