Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dean Tyler, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Albert G Reese Jr., against Port Authority Of Allegheny County, Unnamed Defendants, represented by Michael J Cetra, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2012 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2016 | CASE TERMINATED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 1901. | ||
March 29, 2016 |
Notice of Local Rule JA1901 Termination Notice of CASE TO BE TERMINATED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 1901 published. |
||
June 11, 2012 |
Praecipe for Appearance filed on behalf of Michael J. Cetra Esq. |
||
June 11, 2012 |
Notice of Filing defendants first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents. |
||
June 01, 2012 |
Sheriff Return Port Authority of Allegheny County was served by Served - Adult Agent or person in charge of Defendant(s) office or usual place of business Service Upon JERMONTE BRYANT /REC with Writ of Summons on 6/1/2012. |
||
May 08, 2012 | Praecipe for Writ of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.