Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wilkinsburg Borough School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Katherine L Diamico, against Chandra M Law, Dwight M Law, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2010 |
CategorySci Fa Sur Tax Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2011 |
Satisfaction This judgment satisfied in full and costs paid as per praecipe filed. |
||
May 13, 2011 |
Default Judgment In default of an answer in the amount of $1932.57. Certification of 10 day notice to Dwight M.Law & Chandra M.Law on 10/12/10. Certification of Location. Affidavit of Non-Military Service. Notice of Judgment mailed. |
||
September 14, 2010 |
Sheriff Return Dwight M Law was served by Served - Adult Agent or person in charge of Defendant(s) office or usual place of business Service Upon Dean Tyler with Writ- SCI FA on 9/14/2010. |
||
September 14, 2010 |
Sheriff Return Chandra M Law was served by Served - Adult Agent or person in charge of Defendant(s) office or usual place of business Service Upon Dean Tyler with Writ- SCI FA on 9/14/2010. |
||
September 02, 2010 |
Praecipe - Sci Fa sur Tax Lien DTD-10-078467 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.