Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Simone Mozee, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Channell Ramey, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2015 |
CategoryProtection From Abuse |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2018 |
Order of Court Dated 02/28/18. That the complaint for indirect criminal contempt filed on 02/04/18 is continued generally for 6 months. The final PFA order dated 05/12/15 is extended until 02/28/21. Defendant's bond is reduced to/shall remain R.O.R. pending this general continuance. Eaton,J. |
||
March 14, 2018 |
Indirect Criminal Contempt for violation of PFA order. Hearing to be held on 02/14/18. at 9:00. |
||
February 22, 2018 |
Order of Court - Continuance Order of court dated 02/14/18. Case for ICC is continued to 02/28/18 at 9:00. Defendant's bond to remain at $10K st. Eaton,J. |
||
November 08, 2016 |
Order of Court Dated 10/26/2016. That the complaint for ICC is Dismissed. Clark, J. |
||
October 31, 2016 |
Indirect Criminal Contempt for violation of PFA order. Hearing for ICC to be held on 10/26/2016 at 9:00 A.M. Bail set in the amount of $2KST. |
||
May 19, 2015 |
Final PFA Order of Court Dated 05/12/2015. Final order of court. Channell is excluded from Simone's residence. Costs of filing fees and certification are placed upon Channell. This order expires on 05/12/2018. Clark, J. |
||
May 01, 2015 |
PFA Continuance Order of court dated 04/28/15. Case continued to 05/12/15 at 9:00 before Clark,J. |
||
April 27, 2015 |
Petition for PFA Dated 04/21/2015. Temporary order of court. Channell is excluded from Simone's residence until final hearing which will be held on 04/28/15 at 9:00 am before Bigley, J. (The filing fee for this petition is $256.00) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.