Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jamie Blum, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Amanda Blum, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2014 |
CategoryProtection From Abuse |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2014 |
PFA Withdrawal Dated 05/13/14. At plaintiff's request, PFA Petition is WITHDRAWN. Clark,J. |
||
May 09, 2014 |
Affidavit of Service Of PFA Petition and order upon Amanda by personal service on 04/26/14. |
||
May 08, 2014 |
PFA Continuance Order of court dated 05/06/14. Case continued to 05/13/14 at 9:00 before Clark,J. |
||
May 02, 2014 |
Petition for PFA Dated 04/28/2014. Temporary order of court. Amanda is excluded from Jamie's residence until final hearing which will be held on 05/06/14 at 9:00 am before Bigley, J. (The filing fee for this petition is $244.00) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.