Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Catherine Smith, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Alesha Wade, William Wade, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Allegheny County, PA, . Allegheny County, PA Superior Courts with O'Brien W. Terrence presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeO'Brien W. Terrence Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryDefendant'S Mdj Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationAllegheny County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2022 | Hearing | Trial Call Date | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment by Consent By consent. Order of Court dated 09/15/2022, O'Brien, J. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties MM/DD/YYYY. |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment by Consent | |
September 02, 2022 | Hearing |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: O'Brien W. Terrence |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL CONCILIATION. |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Pretrial Statement | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Scheduled This case is scheduled for Pre-Trial Conference. Date of conference on 09/02/2022 at 10:30 AM in front of Judge O'Brien in Room 705, City-County Building. |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Call Scheduled This case scheduled for trial call on 09/28/2022. |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Arbitration Appeal From the Board of Arbitrators. Compensation of arbitrators in the sum of $60.00. Jury trial waived. Notice sent by Department of Court Records, Civil Division/Certificate of service filed. |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Award for Plaintiff and against Defendants in the amount of $8,891.98. Dated 12/17/21. As per Rule 236 Notice, copies sent to all parties 12/21/2021.. Arbitration Board #39437 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.