Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Metatron Properties Llc, Shelter Management, Inc., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against All Others, Rotan, Nikki W, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Jennifer J. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer J. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit - Purge | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Exhibit Purge 1 PTF ENV |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court Plaintiff to Pay Trial Fee Judge: Taylor, Drew |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - List W/ Witness List |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Stipulated
Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Trial Defendant to File Answer by 5:00PM Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Declaration Non-Military | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute Posting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.