Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ukiah Properties Inc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against All Others, Fagan, Brandon, Rounsville, Maranda, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Jennifer J. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer J. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service Posting - 1/19/2023 |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Mailing | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Declaration Non-Military | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.